MA H2138 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to professional development for state university and community college campus police officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding professional development for state university and community college campus police officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1570 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
H2233 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
S1442 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
S1797 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback