MA H212 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for diaper changing stations in public buildings and accommodations. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Requiring universal changing stations in public buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1146 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2
H2305 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H209 (Similar To) 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1500 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1462 (Similar To) 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4155 (Similar To) 2023-12-04 - Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2514 (Similar To) 2023-12-04 - Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2305 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H209 (Similar To) 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1500 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1462 (Similar To) 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4155 (Similar To) 2023-12-04 - Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2514 (Similar To) 2023-12-04 - Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H212 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H212.pdf |