MA H2117 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of fireworks. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to novelty sparklers
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2015-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2015 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-06-04 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2015-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2727 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2475 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H2476 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4029
H1252 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2969 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2727 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2475 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H2476 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4029
H1252 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2969 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2117 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2117.pdf |