MA H2115 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the distribution of general local aid, unrestricted general government aid and lottery aid to cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To establish a commission to study the distribution of unrestricted local aid
Sponsors
Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] |
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Rep. Ryan Hamilton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4115 (Similar To) 2024-01-10 - New draft substituted, see H4241
S2599 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2599 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2115 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2115.pdf |