MA H2107 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4573
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of local permits for building energy efficiency and decarbonization. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To facilitate the issuance of local permits for building energy efficiency and decarbonization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4573 |
2023-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2110 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4573
H4573 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4573 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2107 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2107.pdf |