MA H2068 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5225
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to overdose notifications for opioid prescribers. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to overdose notifications for opioid prescribers
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Capano [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Paul Tucker [D] |
Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Sen. John Cronin [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5225 |
2021-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2068 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2068.pdf |