MA H206 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the administration of the personal care attendant program by the Division of Medical Assistance. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to cueing and supervision in the PCA program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-02-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-02-15 | House | Accompanied by S107 |
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S107 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H206
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H206 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H206.pdf |