MA H2056 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S239
Note: Replaces legislation H221
Note: Replaces legislation H284
Note: Replaces legislation H3479
Note: Replaces legislation H3555

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the mandatory school age and the establishment of dropout prevention and recovery pilot programs. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to dropout prevention and recovery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-05-21HouseAccompanied by S239, H221, H284, H3479 and H3555
2017-06-15JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S239 (Replaces) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H221 (Replaces) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H284 (Replaces) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H3479 (Replaces) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H3555 (Replaces) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback