MA H2053 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Wayland be authorized to hold annual and special hybrid town meetings. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing remote participation at town meetings in the town of Wayland
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H668 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2053 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2053.pdf |