MA H2052 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4443
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for homeowner heating safety and remediation of oil spills. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for homeowner heating safety and remediation of oil spills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4443 |
2011-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4443 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2052 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10320&generalCourtId=1 |