MA H2035 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to zoning restrictions for land or structures for religious or educational purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To prevent nonprofit institutions from avoiding wetlands or natural resource protections under the so-called Dover Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1286 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1312 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1312 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2035.pdf |