MA H2029 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to changing the board of selectmen of the town of Lanesborough to a select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To use more inclusive language for the Lanesborough board of selectmen
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2023-08-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-08-14 | House | Enacted |
2023-08-10 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2023-08-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-05-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-05-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-05-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-05-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2371 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2024
H4059 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2855 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2937
S2937 (Similar To) 2024-11-18 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2983
H4059 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2855 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2937
S2937 (Similar To) 2024-11-18 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2983
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2029 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2029.pdf |