MA H2012 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the funding and management of the Prevention and Wellness Trust Fund. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote public health through the Prevention and Wellness Trust Fund

Sponsors

Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. John Velis [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-08-15SenateSenate concurred
2019-08-01HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback