MA H1991 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4712
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to substance use disorder evaluations. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to substance use disorder evaluations
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4712 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1250 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1275 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H4712 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
S1275 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H4712 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1991 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1991.pdf |