MA H1981 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to preventing overdose deaths and increasing access to treatment. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to preventing overdose deaths and increasing access to treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S662 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1243 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1243 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1981 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1981.pdf |