MA H1243 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide assistance for access to treatment options for people with obesity. Health Care Financing.
Title
To ensure access to the full range of treatment options for people with obesity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S754 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1243.pdf |