MA H198 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4909

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote employment for people with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote employment for people with disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-11HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4909
2021-11-15JointHearing scheduled for 11/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S878 (Similar To) 2021-09-01 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4124 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4622
S1908 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S411 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S124 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2848
S1192 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4909 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback