MA H1979 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a child and adolescent behavioral health implementation coordinating council. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Establishing a child and adolescent behavioral health implementation coordinating council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H792 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4143 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4143 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1979 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1979.pdf |