MA H1971 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance patient education and informed consent before issuance of opioids. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To enhance patient education and informed consent before issuance of opioids
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1255 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S1271 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1242 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1271 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1242 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1971 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1971.pdf |