MI HB5269 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education: public school academies; a public school academy to post salary information on its website; require. Amends secs. 504a, 506, 525, 527, 557, 560, 1311h & 1311k of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.504a et seq.).
Title
Education: public school academies; a public school academy to post salary information on its website; require. Amends secs. 504a, 506, 525, 527, 557, 560, 1311h & 1311k of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.504a et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/26/2023 |
2023-10-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2023-10-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar |