MA H1967 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4449
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to procedures for prescribing or dispensing pain medications in emergency rooms to certain persons on probation. Public Health.
Title
Relative to emergency room procedure for prescribing or dispensing pain medication to certain persons on probation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4449 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1169 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1967 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1967.pdf |