MA H1966 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4265
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restrict the sale of tobacco products at locations where health professionals are employed. Public Health.
Title
Restricting the sale of tobacco products at health care institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4265 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4265 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H3975
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1966 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1966.pdf |