MA H1963 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote high value and evidence-based behavioral health care. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote high value and evidence-based behavioral health care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-24JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1273 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2789
S765 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1248 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2788

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback