MA H1955 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4492
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a bill of rights for foster parents. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to foster parent rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4492 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-27 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S504 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S129 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
H876 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S46 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H104 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
H2802 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H695 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H149 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3431 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2380 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2421
H4492 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S129 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
H876 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S46 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H104 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
H2802 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H695 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H149 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3431 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2380 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2421
H4492 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1955 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1955.pdf |