MA H1911 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a state health service corps within the Executive Office of Health and Human Services to ensure the quality, affordability and access to primary and preventive health care throughout the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
To ensure quality, affordability and access to primary and preventive health care, to eliminate health disparities, and to enhance economic growth throughout the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4242 |
2015-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1911 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1911.pdf |