MA H1894 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to place the inspection, testing and repair of fire protection systems under the prevailing wage law. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Clarifying the prevailing wage law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4280 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4280 (Replaced by) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1146 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
S1146 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1894 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1894.pdf |