MA H1871 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4449

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize school bus drivers to administer epinephrine. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the access of epinephrine in schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4449
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1843 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H1544 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H463 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1355 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1286 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback