MA S1355 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reduce the risks associated with allergic reactions. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce the risks associated with allergic reactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-29SenateOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-08SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-10-04JointHearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1843 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H1871 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1286 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H841 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H1544 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H463 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback