MA H1870 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of West Boylston to assess sewer privilege fees for certain connections to the common sewer and deposit said fees in the Sewer Enterprise Reserve Fund. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of West Boylston to assess compensatory sewer privilege fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-06-24 | House | Enacted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Read third, (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-05-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1870 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1870.pdf |