MA H1863 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing minimum hourly health improvement wage. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
For a minimum hourly health improvement wage
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1155 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
H1231 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4254 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1231 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4254 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1863 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1863.pdf |