MA H1850 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4781
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to patient access to emergency care. Public Health.
Title
Ensuring safe patient access to emergency care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4781 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1933 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4211
S713 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1239 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2614
H1916 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4211 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4781 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S713 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1239 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2614
H1916 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4211 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4781 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1850.pdf |