MA H1843 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4597

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to transportation management of certain developments. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote transportation demand management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4597
2018-01-24JointHearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 10:00AM-12:00PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
S1967 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2193
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1741 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1903 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3819 (Similar To) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2410 (Similar To) 2018-08-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback