MA H1842 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H1902

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to license plate tracking. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate license plate tracking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseAccompanied H1902
2018-01-24JointHearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1658 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1253 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S477 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Accompanied S479
H94 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3614 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1902 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback