MA H3614 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4528

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the tracking and testing of sexual assault kits. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the tracking and testing of sexual assault kits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4528
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-10-16HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-05-09JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1174 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1241 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2567
S835 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H2289
S902 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3465 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H776 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H777 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H4528 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Reported, in part, by H1188

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback