MA H1828 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4416
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to inspectors of plumbing and gas fitting inspectors. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to additional inspectors; inspector engaging in plumbing or gas fitting work
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
Rep. William Crocker [R] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4416 |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H267 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H301 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4416 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H301 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4416 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1828 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1828.pdf |