MA H1792 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create access to justice. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create access to justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S996 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
H2500 (Similar To) 2021-11-11 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1920 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Senate concurred
H1749 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S806 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S484 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1732 (Similar To) 2021-07-20 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H865 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence
S1346 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S629 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback