MA H1790 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4342

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to temporary motor vehicle registration plates. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to temporary registration plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4342
2017-12-06JointHearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2726 (Similar To) 2017-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2002 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H3903 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H759 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4342 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback