MA H1779 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a permanent commission (including members of the General Court) to study the service standards for sexual assault and domestic violence service providers. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a permanent commission to study the service standards for sexual assault and domestic violence service providers
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1122 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
S2477 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4350 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S314 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2477 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4350 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S314 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1779 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1779.pdf |