MA H1742 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4450
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Murphy of Weymouth, a petition of James M. Murphy, Carole A. Fiola and Bruce J. Ayers that the Bureau of Substance Abuse Services be required to notify local public safety departments upon certification of sober homes, so-called. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to public safety notification for sober homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4450 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1742 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1742.pdf |