MA H1739 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to life sentences without eligibility for parole. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to life without parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1481 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H1471 (Similar To) 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3635 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
H1471 (Similar To) 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3635 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1739 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1739.pdf |