MA H1730 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve access to care by removing barriers to practice for psychiatric nurse mental health clinical specialists. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To remove barriers to practice for psychiatric nurse mental health clinical specialists
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D] |
Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. John Lawn [D] | Rep. David Linsky [D] |
Rep. William Straus [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4535 |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1731 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4535
H4535 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4535 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1730 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1730.pdf |