MA H1710 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to obtaining relief for a child or youth from abuse and harassment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-16JointHearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S878 (Similar To) 2021-09-01 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1908 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1742 (Similar To) 2021-07-20 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1580 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1870 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1007 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S973 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2983 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1027 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1083 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S411 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S2276 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - New draft substituted, see S2612
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S122 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback