MA H1709 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of participation in the slave trade by companies under contract with the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
An act relative to the disclosure of participation in the slave trade in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H381 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1721 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1761 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H381 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1721 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1761 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1709 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1709.pdf |