MA H1703 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4532
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4532
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4532
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to opioid drug manufacturer assessments. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to opioid drug manufacturer assessments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4532 |
2019-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1717 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
H126 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4489
S1168 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1087 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S303 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1160 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2888
H4532 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
H126 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4489
S1168 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1087 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S303 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1160 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2888
H4532 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1703 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1703.pdf |