MA S1160 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Reporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to expand access to patient centered care for opioid use disorder. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding access to patient centered care for opioid use disorder

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24SenateReporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-23SenateReporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-05SenateReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1246 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S700 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H1412 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1239 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2614
S593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H3779 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback