MA H1693 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to employee reference liability. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to employee references

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H2685 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H1624 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H2093 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H904 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1048 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1552 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2684 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H98 (Similar To) 2019-05-29 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1763 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3929 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback