MA H1658 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4506
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect victims of stalking in violation of harassment prevention orders. The Judiciary.
Title
To protect victims of stalking in violation of harassment prevention orders
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4506 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4506 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1658 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1658.pdf |