MA H1636 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the protection of trees from interference by abutting property owners. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the protection of trees from interference by abutting property owners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5170 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1872 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1873 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2131 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H1395 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3007 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H4157 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5170 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1653 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1873 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2131 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H1395 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3007 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H4157 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5170 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1653 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1636 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1636.pdf |