MA H1618 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Koczera of New Bedford, a petition of Robert M. Koczera (by vote of the town) that employees of the school department and clerical and janitorial employees of the town of Acushnet be exempt from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting certain employees of the school department in the town of Acushnet and certain town of Acushnet clerical and janitorial employees from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-08-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-08-29 | House | Enacted |
2011-08-25 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-08-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-08-03 | Senate | Read and placed in Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-08-01 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-07-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-07-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-12-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1618 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12527&generalCourtId=1 |