MA H1589 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Barbara Silva, an employee of the Department of Corrections
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Barbara Silva, an employee of the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-03-24 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2011-03-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-03-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-03-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1589 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11347&generalCourtId=1 |